Global patent index - EP 0989264 A1

EP 0989264 A1 2000-03-29 - Improved electric lock for a motor vehicle door

Title (en)

Improved electric lock for a motor vehicle door

Title (de)

Verbessertes elektrisches Schloss für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Serrure électrique perfectionnée pour portière de vehicule automobile

Publication

EP 0989264 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402219 A

Priority

FR 9811741 A

Abstract (en)

The motor vehicle door lock has door release and bolt and catch assemblies in separate compartments The two compartments lie on opposite sides of a common base (15) extending over the whole area of the lock case (B). A control lever (11), mounted on a stub shaft passing through the base and rotating a catch, releasing the bolt, in the other compartment, is actuated by a peg fixed under a toothed wheel (22), as the wheel rotates. The wheel is driven, via a worm gear, by a geared motor (16) energized on the initial movement of a cable (C) which operates a micro-switch (60), the cable being connected to the exterior door handle. The interior door handle acts directly on the catch. A reversible second motor is mounted (53) so as to control a pivoted (42) locking lever (41) via a toothed peripheral rack (48). This lever is also controllable (43) by a drum (44) turned by a conventional key in an exterior lock barrel, and (45) by an interior e.g. plunger-type manual handle.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure électrique pour portière de véhicule automobile, comportant un boîtier de serrure (B), dont un premier compartiment contient un pêne et un cliquet, et dont un deuxième compartiment (15) contient de manière étanche un levier de condamnation (41) apte à mettre la serrure en position condamnée/décondamnée, et un moteur électrique (16) pour l'assistance à l'ouverture, caractérisée par le fait que, dans le deuxième compartiment, le moteur électrique est apte à entraîner en rotation, par l'intermédiaire d'un train d'engrenages (17-19) une roue dentée (22) munie d'au moins un maneton (24) radialement excentré, ledit maneton étant destiné, lors de la rotation de la roue, à entraîner un levier de commande (11) jusqu'à ce qu'un pion (23a) radialement excentré sur ladite roue vienne en contact avec une butée élastique (27) de fin de course d'ouverture, l'alimentation électrique du moteur étant temporisée pendant une durée suffisante pour assurer que ledit pion atteigne la butée élastique, ledit levier de commande étant solidaire en rotation d'un levier d'ouverture agencé dans le premier compartiment et apte à coopérer avec le cliquet pour le déplacer en position de libération du pêne. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 77/16 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989264 A1 20000329; EP 0989264 B1 20030702; DE 69909204 D1 20030807; DE 69909204 T2 20040527; ES 2203032 T3 20040401; FR 2783551 A1 20000324; FR 2783551 B1 20001117; US 6349983 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20160428

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69909204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69909204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69909204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2203032

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030815

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010622

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI