Global Patent Index - EP 0989266 A1

EP 0989266 A1 2000-03-29 - Lock with automatic unlocking on opening

Title (en)

Lock with automatic unlocking on opening

Title (de)

Schloss mit automatischer Entriegelung beim Öffnen

Title (fr)

Serrure à décondamnation automatique à l'ouverture

Publication

EP 0989266 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402278 A

Priority

FR 9811740 A

Abstract (en)

The lock comprises two compartments and a common base (15) extending over the whole area of the lock case (B). A control lever (11), mounted on a stub shaft passing through the base and rotating a catch, releasing the bolt located within the other compartment. This is actuated by a peg fixed under a toothed wheel (22). The wheel is driven by a geared motor (16) energized on the initial movement of a cable (C) which operates a micro-switch (60), the cable being connected to the exterior door handle. The interior door handle acts directly on the catch. A reversible second motor (53) is mounted so as to control a pivoted locking lever (41) via a toothed peripheral rack (48).

Abstract (fr)

Serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile, comportant un pêne (4) apte à retenir une gâche, un cliquet (5) de blocage du pêne, un mécanisme d'ouverture comportant au moins un moyen d'actionnement (9) apte à coopérer avec le cliquet pour l'amener dans une position de libération du pêne, sous l'action d'un moyen de commande intérieure ou extérieure, et un levier de condamnation pour mettre la serrure dans une position condamnée ou décondamnée, caractérisée par le fait qu'elle comporte un moyen de décondamnation automatique à l'ouverture comportant, d'une part, un élément suiveur de came (13a) coopérant avec un profil de came (4a) prévu sur le pêne (4) et, d'autre part, une portion d'appui apte à coopérer avec une butée prévue sur le levier de condamnation, de façon que, lors de la rotation du pêne vers sa position d'ouverture, le profil de came entraîne un déplacement de l'élément suiveur de came et, par suite, de ladite portion d'appui de façon à amener automatiquement le levier de condamnation dans sa position de décondamnation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/34 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 77/12 (2013.01); E05B 77/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/30 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989266 A1 20000329; EP 0989266 B1 20050706; DE 69926038 D1 20050811; DE 69926038 T2 20060511; FR 2783550 A1 20000324; FR 2783550 B1 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69926038

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69926038

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-02-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-10-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926038 P 20050811

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI