Global Patent Index - EP 0989270 A2

EP 0989270 A2 2000-03-29 - Vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Türschloss eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0989270 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117519 A

Priority

DE 19843422 A

Abstract (en)

The door lock has a pre-mounted lock unit (2) mounted in a hollow space in a vehicle door, attached to the rear of the door and with a lock bearer with a lock catch and pawl adjustably mounted on it. A wall region bounding the hollow vol. on the interior side has a through opening (10) for a transfer element (19) connected to the lock assembly and an actuating element outside the hollow vol. After mounting the lock assembly, part of it covers the through opening and the transfer element is connected to an element (20) of the lock unit via the through opening.

Abstract (de)

Türschloß eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einer vormontierten Schloßbaugruppe (2), die in einem Hohlraum (6) einer Fahrzeugtür (2) angeordnet an dem hinteren Stirnbereich der Fahrzeugtür (1) befestigt ist und einen Schloßträger (3) aufweist, an dem eine Schloßfalle (4) sowie eine in Schließlage die Schloßfalle (4) verriegelnde Sperrklinke (5) verstellbar befestigt sind. Mit einem vom Fahrgastraum her den Hohlraum (6) begrenzenden Wandbereich (9), der eine Durchtrittsöffnung (10) aufweist, durch die ein mit der Schloßbaugruppe (2) verbundenes Übertragungselement (14, Stecker, Seilendteil 19) zu einem außerhalb des Hohlraumes (6) angeordneten Schloßbetätigungselement (Innensicherungsknopf 12, Innentürgriff, Schaltelement) verläuft. Nach der Montage der Schloßbaugruppe (2) überdeckt ein Bereich der Schloßbaugruppe (2) die Durchtrittsöffnung (10) und das mit dem Schloßbetätigungselement (Innensicherungsknopf 12, Türinnengriff, Schaltelement) in Verbindung stehende Übertragungselement (14, Stecker 25, Seilendteil 19) ist durch die Durchtrittsöffnung (10) hindurch mit einem zugeordneten Element (Schwenkhebel 13, Steckeraufnahme 15, Schwenkteil 20) der Schloßbaugruppe (2) zu verbinden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 9/00; E05B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/00 (2006.01); E05B 81/54 (2014.01); E05B 83/36 (2014.01); E05B 85/02 (2014.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 77/34 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/02 (2013.01); E05B 81/54 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); Y10S 292/53 (2013.01); Y10S 292/64 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2522301 A1 19761202 - YMOS METALLWERKE WOLF & BECKER

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989270 A2 20000329; EP 0989270 A3 20030129; EP 0989270 B1 20050810; DE 19843422 A1 20000330; DE 19843422 B4 20040527; DE 19843422 C5 20080306; JP 2000096898 A 20000404; JP 4500383 B2 20100714; US 6457753 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2009-03-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-06-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912383

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 17/22 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 9/00 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI