Global Patent Index - EP 0989278 A2

EP 0989278 A2 2000-03-29 - Shutter assembly

Title (en)

Shutter assembly

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 0989278 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202990 A

Priority

NL 1010155 A

Abstract (en)

System of panels for covering a row of windows separated by non-transparent front parts of one storey. By using two panels for every window and two parallel rails above as well as below the windows the panels can slide upon one another and they can be placed two by two in front of the non-transparent front parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3983674 A 19761005 - YAMAMOTO YUKIO, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989278 A2 20000329; EP 0989278 A3 20020911; NL 1010155 C1 20000324

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI