Global Patent Index - EP 0989279 A2

EP 0989279 A2 2000-03-29 - Venetian blind within insulating glazing

Title (en)

Venetian blind within insulating glazing

Title (de)

Jalousie in Isolierverglasung

Title (fr)

Jalousie dans vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 0989279 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117550 A

Priority

DE 19840331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840331A1] The slats are turned by a turning mechanism (34) and the drive forces are transferred through magnets mounted on drive means on an outside face of the window. The drive means comprises a rotary element (56) and the magnets entrain a linearly displaceable output element (48) associated with the drive means. The magnets can be arranged in a ring on the rotary element and can comprise magnet blocks with a polarisation device aligned perpendicular to the glass pane (14) lying between the rotary element and output element.

Abstract (de)

Zwischen den Glasscheiben (14) einer Isolierverglasung ist eine Lamellenjalousie (12) angeordnet, deren Wendemechanismus (30, 32, 34) mit einer berührungslosen Kraftübertragung durch Magneten (54, 62) an Antriebsmitteln (58, 60) außen und/oder an Abtriebsmitteln (48) zwischen den Glasscheiben (14) eine Neigungsverstellung der Lamellen (28) erlaubt. Bisher bekannte Anordnungen erfordern Getriebestufen zur Umlenkung der Bewegungsrichtung oder lange Führungen der Antriebsmittel. Um eine leichte und funktionssichere Betätigung des Wendemechanismus zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Antriebsmittel als Drehelement (56) über die Magneten (54, 62) ein linear verschiebliches Abtriebselement (48) mitnehmen. Das Drehelement auf der Fensteraußenseite ist Platz sparend und kann nicht überdreht werden, während das linear verschiebliche Abtriebselement eine einfache Kraftübertragung auf den Wendemechanismus ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/264

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/264 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/264 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840331 A1 20000309; EP 0989279 A2 20000329; EP 0989279 A3 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI