Global Patent Index - EP 0989292 A2

EP 0989292 A2 2000-03-29 - Electric throttle actuator

Title (en)

Electric throttle actuator

Title (de)

Elektromotorisches Stellglied, insbesondere mit einer Drosselklappe

Title (fr)

Actionneur électrique de papillon

Publication

EP 0989292 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118566 A

Priority

DE 19843771 A

Abstract (en)

A separate casing for electronics (8) is fastened to the butterfly throttle housing (2). It contains control and/or analysis electronics.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein elektromotorisches Stellglied mit einem Gehäuse und einem auf einer Antriebsseite innerhalb des Gehäuses angeordneten Elektromotores für den Antrieb eines in dem Gehäuse angeordneten beweglichen Elementes, insbesondere einer Drosselklappe, wobei erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen ist, daß an dem Gehäuse ein separates Elektronikgehäuse zur Aufnahme einer Steuer- und/oder Auswerteelektronik befestigbar ist, um einerseits insbesondere elektromagnetische Störeinstrahlungen zu vermeiden und andererseits serienmäßig hergestellte und kein Steuergerät aufweisende elektromotorische Stellglieder weiterverwenden zu können, ohne das Änderungen an der Form zur Herstellung des Stellgliedes erforderlich sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 17/00 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2013.01); F02D 2400/18 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989292 A2 20000329; EP 0989292 A3 20011205; EP 0989292 B1 20050810; BR 9904315 A 20001114; DE 19843771 A1 20000330; KR 100634632 B1 20061013; KR 20000023460 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912384

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090920

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090920

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912384 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040816

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020107

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI