Global patent index - EP 0989293 A3

EP 0989293 A3 2000-11-08 - Load control device

Title (en)

Load control device

Title (de)

Lastverstellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de charge

Publication

EP 0989293 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118628 A

Priority

DE 19843769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989293A2] The emergency running spring (13) and return spring (14) are designed as torsion coil springs, in coaxial arrangement at the opposite end of the butterfly shaft to the motor (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 7/23 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989293 A2 20000329; EP 0989293 A3 20001108; EP 0989293 B1 20040721; BR 9904314 A 20000926; DE 19843769 A1 20000330; KR 20000023458 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060921

2005-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI