Global patent index - EP 0989295 A2

EP 0989295 A2 2000-03-29 - Intake system for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Intake system for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Sauganlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'admission pour un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0989295 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118493 A

Priority

DE 19843772 A

Abstract (en)

The suction system has a resonator constructed as a module (1) consisting of a housing (2) and cover which are inseparably interconnected. A suction line (9) is provided in the housing and is formed at least partially by it. That part of the suction line which is not formed by the resonator housing is covered by a suction line cover which is inseparably connected to the housing. The suction line cover has a guiding section which connects the suction line to the volume of the resonator housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Sauganlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere eine ein Fahrzeug antreibende Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem Resonator, die dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß der Resonator als Resonatormodul (1) ausgebildet ist, wobei das Resonatormodul (1) aus einem Resonatorgehäuse (2) und einem Resonatorgehäusedeckel (21) besteht und das Resonatorgehäuse (2) und der Resonatorgehäusedeckel (21) unlösbar mit einander verbunden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1255 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989295 A2 20000329; EP 0989295 A3 20001115; BR 9904310 A 20000912; DE 19843772 A1 20000330; KR 20000023459 A 20000425; US 6178940 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI