Global Patent Index - EP 0989295 A3

EP 0989295 A3 2000-11-15 - Intake system for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Intake system for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Sauganlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'admission pour un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0989295 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118493 A

Priority

DE 19843772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989295A2] The suction system has a resonator constructed as a module (1) consisting of a housing (2) and cover which are inseparably interconnected. A suction line (9) is provided in the housing and is formed at least partially by it. That part of the suction line which is not formed by the resonator housing is covered by a suction line cover which is inseparably connected to the housing. The suction line cover has a guiding section which connects the suction line to the volume of the resonator housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1255 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989295 A2 20000329; EP 0989295 A3 20001115; BR 9904310 A 20000912; DE 19843772 A1 20000330; KR 20000023459 A 20000425; US 6178940 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI