Global Patent Index - EP 0989297 A1

EP 0989297 A1 2000-03-29 - Internal combustion piston engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion piston engine

Title (de)

Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à piston

Publication

EP 0989297 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810529 A

Priority

  • EP 99810529 A
  • EP 98810944 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has several pumps (7, 107) for feed of fuel and control medium, and one or more accumulators for fuel and control medium connected to the pumps and to the injections system (11) and/or gas exchange system. The engine also has a hydraulic system with components (14) to control fuel injection and gas exchange, a lubricating system for each cylinder, one or more angle transmitters (22,24), and a control unit with several electronic modules to regulate fuel supply and gas exchange and to control starting air supply.

Abstract (de)

Die Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine enthält ein Einspritzsystem zur volumetrischen Einspritzung für jeden Zylinder, eine oder mehrere Hochdruckpumpen (3) zum Zuführen von Brennstoff, mindestens eine Druckpumpe (7,107) zum Zuführen von Steuermedium, jeweils einen Akkumulator (5,8,108) für Brennstoff, Steuer und Arbeitsöl, welche mit den Pumpen als auch mit dem Gaswechselsystem (12) in Verbindung steht, ein hydraulisches System mit Organen zur Steuerung der Einspritzung und Betätigung des Gaswechsels, einen oder mehrere Winkelgeber (25,26) und eine Steuervorrichtung (21) mit einer Zentraleinheit (21) und mehreren elektronischen Steuermodulen (22), um die Startluftzufuhr, die Einspritzung, den Gaswechsel und die Zentralschmierung zu steuern. Die Maschine wird im Normalbetrieb auf rein elektronischem Wege gesteuert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/10; F01L 9/02; F01M 1/06; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2006.01); F01L 3/24 (2006.01); F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F02D 1/16 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 47/04 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F01L 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F02M 59/46 (2013.01); F01M 1/06 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01); F02N 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989297 A1 20000329; EP 0989297 B1 20040929; CN 1204337 C 20050601; CN 1248671 A 20000329; DE 59910639 D1 20041104; DK 0989297 T3 20041025; JP 2000104612 A 20000411; KR 100689947 B1 20070308; KR 20000023307 A 20000425; PL 335359 A1 20000327

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090125

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080610

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN B & W DIESEL A/S

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910639 P 20041104

2004-10-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030528

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI