Global patent index - EP 0989303 A1

EP 0989303 A1 2000-03-29 - Lubrication pump for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Lubrication pump for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Schmierpumpe einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe à huile pour circuit de lubrification d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0989303 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402312 A

Priority

FR 9811793 A

Abstract (en)

The pump consists of a housing (1) containing meshing driving and driven gears (2) on parallel shafts (10), propelling the lubricating oil between suction and pressure sides of the pump. Each of the gear shafts is equipped with a second gear (4) which is connected to the shaft by a spring-loaded key (8, 9). When the pressure on the output side of the shaft reaches a certain level the key is disengaged by oil fed through channels (6, 7) in the housing wall and shaft, and the second gear is disconencted from the drive. When the output pressure drops the second gear is automatically re-engaged.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une pompe à huile pour circuit de lubrification d'un moteur à combustion interne comportant un boîtier (1) comprenant un orifice d'aspiration et un orifice de refoulement débouchant dans un évidement intérieur dans lequel sont disposés un pignon menant (2) solidaire en rotation d'un arbre (10) de commande et un pignon mené monté sur un arbre mené, les pignons étant et aptes à s'engrener mutuellement pour transférer l'huile de l'orifice d'aspiration vers l'orifice de refoulement, caractérisé en ce que la pompe comporte au moins une seconde paire de pignons menant (4) et mené s'engrenant mutuellement, montés respectivement sur les arbres de commande (10) et mené, et des moyens (6 à 9) de manoeuvre aptes à désolidariser ou rendre solidaire en rotation le second pignon (4) menant et l'arbre (10) de commande, en fonction de la pression de refoulement de la pompe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/04; F04C 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F04C 2/14 (2006.01); F04C 2/18 (2006.01); F04C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989303 A1 20000329; EP 0989303 B1 20021009; DE 69903393 D1 20021114; FR 2783575 A1 20000324; FR 2783575 B1 20020308

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021009

2003-01-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903393

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-14

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI