Global Patent Index - EP 0989338 A1

EP 0989338 A1 2000-03-29 - Continuously variable transmission

Title (en)

Continuously variable transmission

Title (de)

Stufenloses Getriebe

Title (fr)

Transmission continue de vitesse

Publication

EP 0989338 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203048 A

Priority

NL 1010144 A

Abstract (en)

Continuously variable transmission having a hydraulically adjustable transmission ratio, a hydraulic circuit that interacts with a reservoir (16), at least two pumps (20, 21) for pumping hydraulic medium from the reservoir (16) to an outflow channel (13) and adjustment means (15, 28, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 37, 39, 40, 41, 42), which act on the circuit, for switching the said pumps (20, 21) in series or in parallel. The adjustment means are suitable for making and breaking hydraulic connections between an outlet opening (26) of the first pump (20) and an inlet opening (25) of the second pump (21), between the outlet opening (26) of the first pump and the outflow channel (13) and between the inlet opening (25) of the second pump (21) and the reservoir (16). The adjustment means (15, 28, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 37, 39, 40, 41, 42) are at least provided with individual hydraulic elements (31, 33) for making and breaking a hydraulic connection between the outlet opening (26) of the first pump (20) and the inlet opening (25) of the second pump (21) and between the reservoir (16) and the inlet opening (25) of the second pump (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 61/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 9/00 (2006.01); F16H 9/18 (2006.01); F16H 61/00 (2006.01); F16H 61/662 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/66272 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0826910 A1 19980304 - DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989338 A1 20000329; EP 0989338 B1 20020904; DE 69902729 D1 20021010; DE 69902729 T2 20030515; JP 2000266169 A 20000926; NL 1010144 C2 20000322; US 6196806 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902729

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100917

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100917

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100917

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902729 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011010

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI