Global Patent Index - EP 0989359 A2

EP 0989359 A2 2000-03-29 - Lamp mountable on a supporting rail

Title (en)

Lamp mountable on a supporting rail

Title (de)

Tragschienenleuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe montable sur un rail de support

Publication

EP 0989359 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98122222 A

Priority

DE 29817256 U

Abstract (en)

The ceiling light fitting has a carrier rail (103) secured to the ceiling and a lamp housing (100), fitted to the underside of the carrier rail via at least one clamp, which has a rotatable operating element (101). The clamp is provided by a spring (102), rotated in conjunction with the operating element, for movement into a position in which the coupling between the lamp housing and the carrier rail is released.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Tragschienenleuchte umfassend eine an einer Decke anbringbare Tragschiene, ein Leuchtengehäuse, das an die Unterseite der Tragschiene montierbar ist, wenigstens eine Klammer zur Herstellung der Verbindung zwischen der Tragschiene und dem Leuchtengehäuse und wenigstens einen Drehriegelverschluß, wobei durch dessen Verdrehen um eine Achse die Verbindung zwischen Tragschiene und Leuchtengehäuse durch Einwirkung auf die Klammer lösbar ist. Die Klammer ist als eine Verschlußfeder (102) ausgebildet, die bei Verdrehen des Drehriegelverschlusses (101) sich mit dem Drehriegelverschluß mitdreht in eine Stellung, in der die Verbindung zur Tragschiene (103) gelöst ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/18 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/025 (2013.01); F21V 17/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19623401 A1 19971218 - THORN LICHT GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817256 U1 19981217; EP 0989359 A2 20000329; EP 0989359 A3 20010822

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI