Global patent index - EP 0989363 A1

EP 0989363 A1 2000-03-29 - Grate bar

Title (en)

Grate bar

Title (de)

Rostblock

Title (fr)

Barreau de grille

Publication

EP 0989363 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810960 A

Priority

EP 98810960 A

Abstract (en)

A part section (16a,16e) of the tube (16) runs laterally in the grate block (1) in a longitudinal direction (L). The part section extends over a fifth of the total length of the grate block. The side walls (29a,29b) and the wall (23) constituting the usage surface form a corner along which the part section runs. The gate block has a front part (24) running vertically to the longitudinal direction and a part section (16g) of the tube runs in this front part vertically to the longitudinal direction. The grate block has a terminal part (21) running vertically to the longitudinal direction and the tube has fluid feed and outlet connections (30,43). These connections are arranged in the area of the terminal part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0844438 A2 19980527 - ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989363 A1 20000329; EP 0989363 B1 20010221; EP 0989363 B2 20031210; CZ 292887 B6 20031217; CZ 9903396 A3 20010117; DE 59800483 D1 20010329; JP 2000104913 A 20000411; KR 100413503 B1 20031231; KR 20000023442 A 20000425; TW 595703 U 20040621

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160901

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-10-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2004-05-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2004-02-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-01-07 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2003-12-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2003-12-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

2002-01-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2002-01-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800483

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-29

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-01-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990304

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI