Global Patent Index - EP 0989363 B1

EP 0989363 B1 2001-02-21 - Grate bar

Title (en)

Grate bar

Title (de)

Rostblock

Title (fr)

Barreau de grille

Publication

EP 0989363 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810960 A

Priority

EP 98810960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989363A1] A part section (16a,16e) of the tube (16) runs laterally in the grate block (1) in a longitudinal direction (L). The part section extends over a fifth of the total length of the grate block. The side walls (29a,29b) and the wall (23) constituting the usage surface form a corner along which the part section runs. The gate block has a front part (24) running vertically to the longitudinal direction and a part section (16g) of the tube runs in this front part vertically to the longitudinal direction. The grate block has a terminal part (21) running vertically to the longitudinal direction and the tube has fluid feed and outlet connections (30,43). These connections are arranged in the area of the terminal part.

Abstract (de)

Das Rostblock (1) für eine Anlage zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfall, umfasst einen im wesentlichen rechteckförmigen, eine Längsrichtung (L) festlegenden Körper mit einem eingegossenen, mäanderförmig verlaufenden Rohr (16), wobei ein Teilabschnitt (16a, 16e) des Rohres (16) in Längsrichtung (L) verlaufend seitlich im Rostblock (1) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0924464 A1 19990623 - KOCH THEODOR [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989363 A1 20000329; EP 0989363 B1 20010221; EP 0989363 B2 20031210; CZ 292887 B6 20031217; CZ 9903396 A3 20010117; DE 59800483 D1 20010329; JP 2000104913 A 20000411; KR 100413503 B1 20031231; KR 20000023442 A 20000425; TW 595703 U 20040621

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160901

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-10-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-05-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2004-02-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-01-07 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2003-12-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2003-12-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2003-04-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

2002-01-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2002-01-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20011116

2002-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800483 20010329

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-01-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990304

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI