Global Patent Index - EP 0989364 A1

EP 0989364 A1 2000-03-29 - Grate element and related method of cooling

Title (en)

Grate element and related method of cooling

Title (de)

Rostelement und Verfahren zum Kühlen desselben

Title (fr)

Elément de grille et procédé de refroidissement de ce dernier

Publication

EP 0989364 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810961 A

Priority

EP 98810961 A

Abstract (en)

The grate blocks (4,5) are formed as fixed blocks (4) and blocks (5) movable in a longitudinal direction. Each block has a foot (26) which locates on the next block in the longitudinal direction. Only the fixed blocks are formed for cooling by a fluid, for which purpose they are provided with a fluid feed conduit and a fluid outlet conduit. The fixed and movable blocks alternate in the longitudinal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 7/08; F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0713056 A1 19960522 - VON ROLL UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989364 A1 20000329; EP 0989364 B1 20000426; DE 59800138 D1 20000608; JP 2000121013 A 20000428

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100925

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800138

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-11-13 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-10-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI SE

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800138 20000608

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990304

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI