Global Patent Index - EP 0989364 B1

EP 0989364 B1 2000-04-26 - Grate element and related method of cooling

Title (en)

Grate element and related method of cooling

Title (de)

Rostelement und Verfahren zum Kühlen desselben

Title (fr)

Elément de grille et procédé de refroidissement de ce dernier

Publication

EP 0989364 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810961 A

Priority

EP 98810961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989364A1] The grate blocks (4,5) are formed as fixed blocks (4) and blocks (5) movable in a longitudinal direction. Each block has a foot (26) which locates on the next block in the longitudinal direction. Only the fixed blocks are formed for cooling by a fluid, for which purpose they are provided with a fluid feed conduit and a fluid outlet conduit. The fixed and movable blocks alternate in the longitudinal direction.

Abstract (de)

Das Rostelement (3) für eine Anlage zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfall, umfasst eine Mehrzahl von in einer Längsrichtung (L) hintereinander angeordnete Rostblöcke (4,5), welche als feststehende Rostblöcke (4) und in Längsrichtung (L) bewegliche Rostblöcke (5) ausgestaltet sind, wobei jeder Rostblock (4,5) einen Fuss (26) aufweist, welcher auf dem in Längsrichtung (L) nachfolgenden Rostblock (4,5) aufliegt, wobei nur die feststehenden Rostblöcke (4) zum Kühlen mit einem Fluid ausgestaltet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 7/08; F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989364 A1 20000329; EP 0989364 B1 20000426; DE 59800138 D1 20000608; JP 2000121013 A 20000428

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100925

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-11-13 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-10-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI SE

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990304

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI