Global patent index - EP 0989366 A1

EP 0989366 A1 2000-03-29 - A valve unit for automatically regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas

Title (en)

A valve unit for automatically regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas

Title (de)

Ventileinheit zur automatischen Regelung der Brenngasdurchflussmenge

Title (fr)

Une unité de soupape pour commander automatiquement le débit de gaz

Publication

EP 0989366 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202043 A

Priority

IT PD980164 A

Abstract (en)

The valve unit described is for automatically regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas to a device for heating a fluid in dependence on variations in the flow-rate of the fluid through the heating device. The unit comprises means (36) for bringing about, in the fluid, a pressure differential correlated with the flow-rate of fluid flowing through a pipe (36a), actuator means (35a) which are supplied with the pressure differential in order to generate a signal correlated with the pressure-differential value, and means (4,10), controlled by the actuator means (35a), for regulating the flow-rate of fuel gas in order to vary the flow-rate of gas in a manner correlated with the fluid-pressure differential; the means for regulating the flow-rate of gas comprise a pressure regulator (4, 10) with a diaphragm (19), and the actuator means (35a) act on the regulating means by means of the control mediated by the pressure regulator (4, 10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/087 (2013.01); F23N 2025/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01); F23N 2035/20 (2013.01); F23N 2035/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0035147 A1 19810909 - VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE], et al
  • [A] EP 0697563 A1 19960221 - INTEGRA SRL [IT]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 104 (M - 212) 6 May 1983 (1983-05-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 060 (M - 010) 6 May 1980 (1980-05-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 060 (M - 010) 6 May 1980 (1980-05-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989366 A1 20000329; IT PD980164 A1 20000103

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010524

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI