Global Patent Index - EP 0989372 A3

EP 0989372 A3 2000-04-19 - Improvements relating to heating apparatus

Title (en)

Improvements relating to heating apparatus

Title (de)

Heizgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de chauffage

Publication

EP 0989372 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99115641 A

Priority

GB 9820673 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989372A2] The invention provides a heat exchange system wherein primary fluid (heated water) is circulated by means of a pump (34) through a heat exchanger (33) through which secondary fluid (water to be heated) is also circulated, and including sensing means (42, 47) for controlling the rate of heat supplied to the heat exchanger (33) via the primary fluid, characterised in that the sensing means (42, 47) comprises a temperature sensor means (42, 47) which is arranged to sense the rate of change of temperature of the primary and/or secondary fluid issuing from the heat exchanger (33). Preferably, there are two temperature sensors (42, 47) which respectively sense the rate of change of temperature of the secondary water and primary water such that in use, when a pre set rate of change of temperature in the secondary water is detected (showing that the secondary water is flowing), the pump (34) is switched on for the supply of hot primary water, and the rate of change of temperature of the primary water is used to control the pump (34) to control the temperature of the secondary water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01); F24D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1009 (2013.01); F24D 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0807790 A2 19971119 - SOLVIS SOLARSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989372 A2 20000329; EP 0989372 A3 20000419; GB 9820673 D0 19981118

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050923

2002-07-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI