Global Patent Index - EP 0989373 A2

EP 0989373 A2 2000-03-29 - Device for producing a predetermined relative humidity in the air

Title (en)

Device for producing a predetermined relative humidity in the air

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer definierten relativen Luftfeuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour produire une humidité relative déterminée dans l'air

Publication

EP 0989373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118774 A

Priority

AT 62298 U

Abstract (en)

A saturator chamber (1) is linked to a measuring chamber (2) by a connecting pipe (4.1,4.2), both with equal temperatures. Relative humidity is adjusted by a mere variation in the saturator chamber pressure (p1) and the measuring chamber pressure (p2). A valve unit (5) is fitted in the connecting pipe. Thermal contact is maintained with a heating device (6) by the valve unit and an area of the connector pipe between the valve unit and the saturator chamber.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer definierten relativen Luftfeuchte angegeben. Diese besteht aus einer Sättigerkammer sowie einer mittels mindestens einer Verbindungsleitung damit verbundenen Meßkammer. Die relative Luftfeuchte ist durch die bloße Variation der Drücke in der Sättigerkammer und der Meßkammer einstellbar. In der Meßkammer liegt in einer möglichen Ausführungsform im wesentlichen die gleiche Temperatur wie in der Sättigerkammer vor. In der Verbindungsleitung ist desweiteren eine Ventileinheit angeordnet. Sowohl die Ventileinheit als auch der zwischen Ventileinheit und Sättigerkammer befindliche Bereich der Verbindungsleitung stehen in thermischem Kontakt mit einer Heizeinrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 6/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05D 22/00 (2006.01); F24F 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 6/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H09257283 A 19970930 - CHINO CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989373 A2 20000329; EP 0989373 A3 20020724; EP 0989373 B1 20040811; AT 3403 U1 20000225; DE 59910183 D1 20040916; JP 2000112534 A 20000421; US 6299147 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140923

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 273488 T

- Effective date: 20140923

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910183 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI