Global patent index - EP 0989374 A2

EP 0989374 A2 2000-03-29 - Cross flow blower

Title (en)

Cross flow blower

Title (de)

Querstromlüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur à courant transversal

Publication

EP 0989374 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99126029 A

Priority

  • EP 96114662 A
  • JP 23491695 A

Abstract (en)

The constitution is characterized by installing a cross flow fan (18) having impellers composed of plural blades (19) arranged in a columnar form, inside a casing forming a draft path inside comprising suction ports and a blowing port(12); disposing a stabilizer (21) forming and a rear quide (23) which forms a diffuser from the cross flow fan (18) and the blowing port(12); and forming a vertical guide blade (25) for controlling the stream of air flow in the vertical direction at the blowing port (12), wherein the vertical guide blade (25) is disposed so that 1/2 or more of the chord length may be present outside of the diffuser in the normal operation state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/06; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/15 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0025 (2013.01); F24F 13/24 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763698 A1 19970319; EP 0763698 B1 20010530; CN 1080838 C 20020313; CN 1147600 A 19970416; CN 1254642 C 20060503; CN 1362585 A 20020807; EP 0989374 A2 20000329; EP 0989374 A3 20010418; EP 0989374 B1 20041124; ES 2158981 T3 20010916; ES 2234201 T3 20050616; GR 3036448 T3 20011130; JP H0979601 A 19970328; KR 100408598 B1 20040320

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2234201

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050400331

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-11-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0763698

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES GR IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 763698

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT