Global Patent Index - EP 0989374 A3

EP 0989374 A3 2001-04-18 - Cross flow blower

Title (en)

Cross flow blower

Title (de)

Querstromlüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur à courant transversal

Publication

EP 0989374 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99126029 A

Priority

  • EP 96114662 A
  • JP 23491695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763698A1] The constitution is characterized by installing a cross flow fan (18) having impellers composed of plural blades (19) arranged in a columnar form, inside a casing forming a draft path inside comprising suction ports and a blowing port(12); disposing a stabilizer (21) forming and a rear quide (23) which forms a diffuser from the cross flow fan (18) and the blowing port(12); and forming a vertical guide blade (25) for controlling the stream of air flow in the vertical direction at the blowing port (12), wherein the vertical guide blade (25) is disposed so that 1/2 or more of the chord length may be present outside of the diffuser in the normal operation state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/06; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/15 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0025 (2013.01); F24F 13/24 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 594 (M - 1703) 14 November 1994 (1994-11-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 09 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 447 (M - 1464) 17 August 1993 (1993-08-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 042 (M - 359) 22 February 1985 (1985-02-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763698 A1 19970319; EP 0763698 B1 20010530; CN 1080838 C 20020313; CN 1147600 A 19970416; CN 1254642 C 20060503; CN 1362585 A 20020807; EP 0989374 A2 20000329; EP 0989374 A3 20010418; EP 0989374 B1 20041124; ES 2158981 T3 20010916; ES 2234201 T3 20050616; GR 3036448 T3 20011130; JP H0979601 A 19970328; KR 100408598 B1 20040320

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234201 T3

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400331

2004-11-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0763698 P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GR IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 763698

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT