Global Patent Index - EP 0989379 A1

EP 0989379 A1 2000-03-29 - Advanced turret armour

Title (en)

Advanced turret armour

Title (de)

Fortgeschrittene Turmpanzerung

Title (fr)

Blindage avancé de tourelle

Publication

EP 0989379 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402275 A

Priority

FR 9811995 A

Abstract (en)

The turret's armour includes a panel (8) fixed to the turret shell (10) and extending along the barrel (4) of its gun, and a forward armoured caisson (9) which connects the panel (8) or an assembly of panels rigidly to the turret shell over a surface projecting some distance from the gun embrasure (5). The caisson is set at a distance from the shell (10) to leave a free space for access to the vehicle driving position trap door (2).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de protection par blindage de la zone d'embrasure 5 du canon 4 de la tourelle 3 d'un véhicule blindé, permettant l'ouverture d'une trappe 2 d'accès au poste de pilotage du véhicule. Il est constitué : d'une plaque 8 solidaire de la carapace 10 de la tourelle s'étendant le long du canon et à proximité immédiate de celui-ci, et d'un caisson frontal blindé 9 reliant rigidement la plaque 8 à la carapace 10 sur une surface éloignée de l'embrasure 5, ledit caisson 9 étant distant de la carapace pour délimiter un espace libre à la verticale de la trappe. Application aux véhicules militaires. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 23/24; F41H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/24 (2006.01); F41H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/20 (2013.01); F41A 23/24 (2013.01); F41H 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989379 A1 20000329; EP 0989379 B1 20021211; DE 69904419 D1 20030123; DE 69904419 T2 20030828; FR 2783909 A1 20000331; FR 2783909 B1 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110917

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904419

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110917

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100909

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904419 20030123

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000415

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI