Global Patent Index - EP 0989477 A2

EP 0989477 A2 2000-03-29 - Control device with an actuator having two-degrees-of-freedom movement

Title (en)

Control device with an actuator having two-degrees-of-freedom movement

Title (de)

Bedienvorrichtung mit einem Stellglied mit mindestens zwei Verstellfreiheitsgraden

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande avec un actionneur à mouvement de deux degrés de liberté

Publication

EP 0989477 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118658 A

Priority

DE 19843854 A

Abstract (en)

The operating device comprises a positioning element (1) with at least two degrees of freedom, and a device (3, 5, 6, 9, 11) for an optical evaluation of the position of the positioning element. There is a unit (3, 11) for an optical variation of a ray of light (LS, LR) with respect to its intensity or spectral characteristics. This is activated with the positioning element, and the change is detected with an optical sensor (6, 9).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Bedienvorrichtung mit einem Stellglied (1) mit mindestens zwei Verstellfreiheitsgraden, ist vorgesehen, daß sie eine Vorrichtung (3, 5, 6) zur optischen Auswertung der Stellung des Stellgliedes (1) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 9/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/08 (2006.01); G05G 9/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2013.01); G05G 2009/04759 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989477 A2 20000329; EP 0989477 A3 20030102; DE 19843854 A1 20000330; US 6545662 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI