Global Patent Index - EP 0989532 A1

EP 0989532 A1 2000-03-29 - Electronic alarm for looking after a child

Title (en)

Electronic alarm for looking after a child

Title (de)

Elektronischer Alarm zur Überwachung eines Kindes

Title (fr)

Alarme électronique pour la surveillance d'un enfant

Publication

EP 0989532 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830559 A

Priority

EP 98830559 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus consists of two interacting devices of which the device A, to be stable put ont eh child body, provides a code limited power transmitter transmitting in continuous impulses to a second device B, kept by the locking after person, provides a receiver with the same code to be put in stand-by by the receivement of the same impulses. When the receivement of said impulses comes to stop owing to the exit of the receiver B from the radius of action of the transmitter A caused by the taking away of the child beyond an arranged safety limit, a sound signal and/or light signal starts so alerting the looking after person.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989532 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2001-01-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI