Global patent index - EP 0989542 A1

EP 0989542 A1 2000-03-29 - Method and device for active noise cancellation in open telephone booths

Title (en)

Method and device for active noise cancellation in open telephone booths

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur aktiven Geräuschminderung in offenen Telefonzellen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la suppression active du bruit pour des bornes téléphoniques

Publication

EP 0989542 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115460 A

Priority

DE 19842804 A

Abstract (en)

The active noise canceling method provides compensation of background noise, preferably between 500 to 800 Hz, using anti-phase noise signals produced within the telephone booth (2). A microphone (4) detects the background noise which is fed to a digital filter to produce a compensation signal to be supplied to loudspeakers (3.1, 3.2). The filter coefficients may be adapted in dependence on the microphone signals. An Independent claim is included for a noise canceling device applying the method of the invention.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur aktiven Geräuschminderung in offenen Telefonzellen nach dem Prinzip der Kompensation durch gegenphasige Einspeisung des Umgebungsgeräusches in die Telefonzelle, wobei unter Zuhilfenahme einer einfachen Lautsprecher- und Mikrofonanordnung und einer Anordnung von digitalen Filtern das Umgebungsgeräusch, welches in die Telefonzelle eindringt, kompensiert wird. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/178

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/178 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/1788 (2013.01); G10K 2210/12 (2013.01); G10K 2210/3027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5594803 A 19970114 - FUJIWARA SUSUMU [JP], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842804 A1 20000323; EP 0989542 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031017

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI