Global Patent Index - EP 0989569 A2

EP 0989569 A2 2000-03-29 - Inductive component with a bar core

Title (en)

Inductive component with a bar core

Title (de)

Induktives Bauelement mit einem Stabkern

Title (fr)

Composant inductif avec un noyau en forme de baguette

Publication

EP 0989569 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99203009 A

Priority

DE 19843415 A

Abstract (en)

The inductive component (1) has a rod-shaped core (2) carrying a coil former (3) for a current coil winding enclosing the core axis. The width of the innermost winding layer is less than the length of the core, the width of the winding layers (4) increasing in the outwards direction from the innermost winding layer. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) a coil former for an inductive component; (b) an application of an inductive component as a coil; (c) an application of an inductive component as a transformer

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein induktives Bauelement (1) mit einem Stabkern (2) und einem Wickelkörper (3), in den die Stabkernachse umschließende Stromwindungslagen (4) eingebettet sind. Um einer Erhitzung des induktiven Bauelements entgegenzuwirken, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Breite der innersten Stromwindungslage kleiner als die Stabkernlänge ist und daß die Breite der Stromwindungslagen von innen nach außen zunimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 38/10 (2006.01); H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H01F 5/02 (2006.01); H01F 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/10 (2013.01); H01F 27/2876 (2013.01); H05B 41/2822 (2013.01); H01F 5/02 (2013.01); H01F 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843415 A1 20000323; EP 0989569 A2 20000329; EP 0989569 A3 20010404; JP 2000114066 A 20000421; US 2002057169 A1 20020516

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 27/28 A, 7H 01F 5/02 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI