Global Patent Index - EP 0989574 A3

EP 0989574 A3 2001-03-28 - Controling serial switch

Title (en)

Controling serial switch

Title (de)

Serienkontrollschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de série avec contrôle

Publication

EP 0989574 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117332 A

Priority

DE 19843934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989574A2] The switch has an illumination and monitoring arrangement for visual display of operational readiness and for state monitoring. The illumination and monitoring arrangement is mounted in the upper part (1) of a multi-part switch socket (2) with two lighting holders (3), each with an associated actuating element (4) and light output point (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989574 A2 20000329; EP 0989574 A3 20010328; DE 19843934 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040401

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI