Global patent index - EP 0989575 A2

EP 0989575 A2 2000-03-29 - Electromagnetic relay

Title (en)

Electromagnetic relay

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Relais

Title (fr)

Relais électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0989575 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116499 A

Priority

DE 19843617 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetic relay has a contact arrangement and a magnet system that includes a yoke (20) and an armature (30) movably mounted on the yoke, and further includes a leaf-spring (10,50) which lies flat and is fixed with a fixture section (12,14) on a smooth seating or mounting section (23,33) of a rigid carrier formed by the yoke (20) and/or the armature (30). The spring section (13,15,51) has a given amount of play (s1,s2,s3) perpendicularly to the plane of the fixture section. Between the seating or mounting section (23,33,43) and a free end (24,32,41) of the carrier is formed a roll-off zone, wedge-shaped in the idle state, for the leaf-spring (10) and which is formed by a convex curvature of a roll-off section (25,35,55) of the carrier (22,30) and/or of the leaf-spring (50) away from the plane of the seating or mounting section (23,33,43).

Abstract (de)

Das Relais besitzt eine Blattfeder, die auf einem ebenen Auflageabschnitt (23) eines Jochschenkels (22) und/oder einem ebenen Auflageabschnitt (33) eines Ankers (30) befestigt ist und sich mit einem unbefestigten Federabschnitt über das freie Ende (24; 32) des Jochschenkels (22) bzw. des Ankers (30) hinweg erstreckt. Um bei Stößen eine plastische Deformierung der Blattfeder zu vermeiden, geht der ebene Auflageabschnitt (23; 33) jeweils in einen konvex gekrümmten Abrollabschnitt (25; 35) über, auf dem die Blattfeder bei einem Stoß abrollt, ohne sich bleibend zu verbiegen. Das Ende der Abrollbewegung wird zweckmäßigerweise durch einen Anschlag begrenzt. Auf diese Weise wird sichergestellt, daß das Relais auch bei stärkeren Stößen keine bleibende Veränderung seiner Kennwerte erleidet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/24 (2006.01); H01H 50/28 (2006.01); H01H 50/30 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01); H01H 50/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/28 (2013.01); H01H 50/30 (2013.01); H01H 50/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989575 A2 20000329; EP 0989575 A3 20010321; EP 0989575 B1 20070103; AT 350759 T 20070115; DE 19843617 C1 20000629; DE 59914118 D1 20070215; JP 2000100306 A 20000407; JP 4180200 B2 20081112; KR 100648750 B1 20061123; KR 20000023392 A 20000425; US 6133813 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150817

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-06-29 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

- Effective date: 20120529

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070823

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-09-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-06-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-04-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914118

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI