Global Patent Index - EP 0989590 A1

EP 0989590 A1 2000-03-29 - Incandescent electric lamp

Title (en)

Incandescent electric lamp

Title (de)

Elektrische Glühlampe

Title (fr)

Lampe électrique à incandescence

Publication

EP 0989590 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117327 A

Priority

DE 19843853 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical filament lamp has a lamp holder (12), a metal luminous element (14) fitted in the lamp holder for generating radiation in an infrared and visible range, also a filter (35) partly attached to the lamp holder reflecting radiation in an infrared range and permeable to selected wave lengths of radiation in a visible range.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Glühlampe mit einem Lampengefäß (12), einem im Lampengefäß (12) angeordneten metallischen Leuchtkörper (14) zur Erzeugung von Strahlung im infraroten und im sichtbaren Bereich, einem zumindest teilweise auf dem Lampengefäß (12) aufgebrachten Filter (35), der Strahlung im infraroten Bereich reflektiert und zumindest für ausgewählte Wellenlängen der Strahlung im sichtbaren Bereich durchlässig ist, wobei der Leuchtkörper (14) flächig, insbesondere bandförmig ausgebildet ist. Sie betrifft überdies ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer derartigen elektrischen Glühlampe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/02 (2006.01); H01K 1/14 (2006.01); H01K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989590 A1 20000329; CN 1248786 A 20000329; DE 19843853 A1 20000330; JP 2000100390 A 20000407; KR 20000023334 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2001-04-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI