Global Patent Index - EP 0989627 B1

EP 0989627 B1 2002-11-13 - Dual frequency antenna

Title (en)

Dual frequency antenna

Title (de)

Dualfrequenzantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne à double fréquence

Publication

EP 0989627 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810946 A

Priority

EP 98810946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989627A1] The antenna has a conducting coating (2) with at least one coupling opening (3)./ There is a strip conductor network (4) at a small distance from the conducting coating, near the coupling opening, and at least one conducting patch (5) on the opposite side from the coupling opening. The essentially rectangular conducting coating is connected to earth (14) at an edge, and has an opposing free end. The length of the second lateral edge (11) of the conducting coating is approximately (2n+1) asterisk lamba2/4, where n is a natural number or zero, lambda2 = c/f2, in which c is the speed of light and f2 is the lower of the two operating frequencies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 5/00; H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 5/40 (2015.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/106 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 5/40 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0414 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0442 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0457 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989627 A1 20000329; EP 0989627 B1 20021113; DE 59806281 D1 20021219; DK 0989627 T3 20030310; ES 2186997 T3 20030516

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150921

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150922

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150921

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150921

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806281

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2005-09-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186997 T3

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806281 20021219

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUBER+SUHNER AG

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUBER & SUHNER AG

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011205

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI