Global Patent Index - EP 0989637 A1

EP 0989637 A1 2000-03-29 - Device for assembling a cable

Title (en)

Device for assembling a cable

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Konfektionierung eines Kabels

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'assemblage d'un câble

Publication

EP 0989637 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117838 A

Priority

  • EP 99117838 A
  • EP 98810939 A

Abstract (en)

The cable preparation device consists of a unit for holding and cutting the cable (8) with a blade block that requires no setting for a cable change and/or during production and with which at least one processing step involved in cable preparation can be performed. The blade block has insulation stripping blades (15) and/or at least one guide plate and/or an insertion hopper (13).

Abstract (de)

Diese Konfektioniereinheit (1) bearbeitet Kabelenden, wobei die Kabelenden nachgeschnitten, abisoliert und Kontakte mittels Crimpverbindungen angeschlossen werden. Die Konfektioniereinheit (1) besteht aus den Baueinheiten Greifereinheit (2), Messerkopf (3), Ausstosser (4), Justiereinrichtung (5) und Crimpeinrichtung (6), wobei die Baueinheiten an einem Maschinenrahmen (7) angeordnet sind. Das Kabelende eines Kabels (8) wird manuell bis zu einem Bearbeitungsbereich (9) vorgeschoben, wobei ein Auslöser (10) die korrekte Position des Kabelendes feststellt und den Bearbeitungsvorgang auslöst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28; H01R 43/05; H01R 43/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/05 (2006.01); H01R 43/052 (2006.01); H01R 43/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/05 (2013.01); H01R 43/052 (2013.01); H01R 43/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989637 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI