Global Patent Index - EP 0989657 A3

EP 0989657 A3 2000-04-19 - Alternator for vehicle

Title (en)

Alternator for vehicle

Title (de)

Wechselstromgenerator für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Alternateur pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0989657 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118718 A

Priority

  • EP 97944186 A
  • JP 5498897 A
  • JP 9701840 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989657A2] The present invention is related to an improvement of heat dissipation of the coil-end portions of a stator. The coil-end portions 54 and 55 are disposed around cooling fans 33 and 34 closely, and outer coil ends of the coil-end portions are disposed to be close to the frames 11 and 12 via insulating layers 10a. The coil ends are spaced apart from one another like a cluster except the base portions, and the resistance of cooling air draft inside the coil-end portions is lower than that around the coil-end portions. Therefore, the cooling air mainly passes through the inside of the coil-end portions 54 and 55 so that most of the coil ends can be cooled, thereby providing a high heat dissipation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 9/06; H02K 3/24; H02K 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 3/12 (2006.01); H02K 3/24 (2006.01); H02K 3/34 (2006.01); H02K 9/06 (2006.01); H02K 9/22 (2006.01); H02K 1/32 (2006.01); H02K 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 3/34 (2013.01); H02K 3/12 (2013.01); H02K 3/24 (2013.01); H02K 9/06 (2013.01); H02K 9/22 (2013.01); H02K 1/325 (2013.01); H02K 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989657 A2 20000329; EP 0989657 A3 20000419; EP 0989657 B1 20050223; DE 69732578 D1 20050331; DE 69732578 T2 20051229; EP 0915557 A1 19990512; EP 0915557 A4 19990512; EP 0915557 B1 20010509; WO 9840953 A1 19980917; WO 9840956 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69732578

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121020

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121020

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121020

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051124

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732578 P 20050331

2005-02-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0915557 P

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 915557

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI