Global Patent Index - EP 0989670 A3

EP 0989670 A3 2000-09-06 - Surface acoustic wave device comprising langasite single crystal substrate

Title (en)

Surface acoustic wave device comprising langasite single crystal substrate

Title (de)

Akustische Oberflächenwellenanordnung mit monokristallinem Langasitsubstrat

Title (fr)

Dispositif à ondes acoustiques de surface comportant un substrat de langasite monocristaline

Publication

EP 0989670 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118643 A

Priority

JP 26852098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989670A2] A surface acoustic wave device including a substrate and an electrode structure formed on the substrate, said substrate being made of a doubly rotated Y-cut ( alpha X-Y cut) Langasite (La3Ga5SiO14), a rotation angle alpha from the X axis being substantially 50 DEG +/-5 DEG and a rotation angle from the Y axis being substantially 19 DEG +/-30 DEG . The device further includes a normal type electrode structure which reveals a natural single-phase unidirectional transducer property together with an anisotropy of the substrate. The device further has a double electrode type electrode structure which cancels the directionality, or a floating type electrode structure which reverses the directionality, the electrode structure is formed to constitute a surface acoustic wave filter having a low insertion loss and an excellent phase property. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 9/02; H03H 9/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/145 (2006.01); H03H 9/02 (2006.01); H03H 9/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/0259 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0865156 A2 19980916 - NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al
  • [DA] JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., vol. 37, no. 5b, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO., JP, XP000885246, ISSN: 0021-4922

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989670 A2 20000329; EP 0989670 A3 20000906; JP 2000101383 A 20000407; JP 3291255 B2 20020610; US 6194809 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040722

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI