Global patent index - EP 0989694 A1

EP 0989694 A1 2000-03-29 - Method for determining a switching moment

Title (en)

Method for determining a switching moment

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung eines Schaltzeitpunktes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer l'instant de commutation

Publication

EP 0989694 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98402330 A

Priority

EP 98402330 A

Abstract (en)

A method to determine a switching moment (Ti) of a switch (SWi) is provided. The switch is coupled to an optical combiner (OC) of a tree-like optical network. The optical combiner enables multiple access of information signals (IN1, ..., INi, ... INn) which are upstream transmitted from network units (NU1, NU1', NU1'', ..., NUi, ..., NUn) to a line terminator (LT) via the cascade connection of dedicated branches (B1, .., Bi, ..., Bn), the optical combiner and a common branch (BC). The switch passes an information signal (INi) at an approximated switching moment (APP-Ti) when the information signal is present and interrupts the branch when the information signal is not present. The method includes the steps of : a) capturing downstream grant information by a control network unit (CTRL-NU) which is coupled between the switch and the line terminator; and b) determining the approximated switching moment by the control network unit based upon the downstream grant information; and c) upstream transmitting by one of the network units coupled to this one dedicated branch a predefined bit pattern (PAT) similar to the information signal. In the event when the predefined bit pattern is passing through the switch, the predefined bit pattern is truncated and a truncated bit pattern (PAT-TR) is provided which is related to the approximated switching moment; and d) detecting by the line terminator reception of the truncated bit pattern; and e) determining by the line terminator a measure of how much the predefined bit pattern is truncated and providing thereby a truncation measure (TR); and f) calculating in function of the truncation measure a calibration value (CAL-SWi) for the switching moment; g) providing the calibration value to the control network unit in order to determine the switching moment in function of the calibration value and the approximated switching moment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 10/207; H04J 14/08; H04Q 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/20 (2006.01); H04B 10/00 (2006.01); H04B 10/02 (2006.01); H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04J 3/0605 (2013.01); H04J 3/0682 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0062 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0067 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989694 A1 20000329; EP 0989694 B1 20040519; CA 2282911 A1 20000323; DE 69823995 D1 20040624; DE 69823995 T2 20050616; JP 2000151524 A 20000530; US 6239887 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080923

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69823995

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI