Global Patent Index - EP 0989746 A2

EP 0989746 A2 2000-03-29 - Imaging apparatus having a high-speed imaging function with electronic zoom circuit

Title (en)

Imaging apparatus having a high-speed imaging function with electronic zoom circuit

Title (de)

Bildaufnahmevorrichtung eine Hochgeschwindigkeitsbildaufnahmefunktion mit elektronischer Zoomschaltung aufweisend

Title (fr)

Appareil de prise de vue ayant une fonction de prise de vue à grande vitesse avec circuit de zoom électronique

Publication

EP 0989746 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118050 A

Priority

  • JP 27385198 A
  • JP 27287998 A

Abstract (en)

A video camera (100) that has a high-speed imaging function capable of reading the electrical charge from a solid-state imaging section (1) a plurality of times during one field period and displaying a plurality of images on a display (8), has a blanking circuit (14) that leaves blanks at least one image of the plurality of images. The video camera (100) also has a shift function that, when one image is left and the others are blank, shifts the position on the display of that one image. An electronic zoom circuit (105) of the video camera (100) inputs a video signal that includes n images (where n is an integer 2 or greater) within one field period, and a sync pulse that has a frequency that is n times the frequency of a vertical sync signal that is included in the video signal, and enlarges the n images included in the video signal about distinctive zooming centers, based on the sync pulse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/232

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 3/15 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 3/1562 (2013.01); H04N 5/232 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989746 A2 20000329; EP 0989746 A3 20020731; EP 0989746 B1 20080116; DE 69937984 D1 20080306; DE 69937984 T2 20090108

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69937984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69937984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69937984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69937984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2008-12-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69937984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-01-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MIYAHARA, HIROYUKI

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TAGUCHI, KENJI

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MATSUOKA, KENJI

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ASO, MICHIHIRO

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI