Global Patent Index - EP 0989774 A3

EP 0989774 A3 2000-04-05 - Audio system having a mixing function

Title (en)

Audio system having a mixing function

Title (de)

Audiosystem mit Mischfunktion

Title (fr)

Système audiophonique avec mixer

Publication

EP 0989774 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99118908 A

Priority

JP 27173198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989774A2] An audio system (1) has a plurality of sound sources, each producing an audio signal. There is provided a plurality of timer means for operating one of the sound sources to produce a first audio signal for a predetermined period before a start time instructed by a user, and for operating another sound source to produce a second audio signal at the start time. A plurality of mixing circuits (5) are provided for mixing the first and second audio signals from two sound sources. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 15/04 (2006.01); G11B 20/02 (2006.01); H03G 3/02 (2006.01); H04H 20/10 (2008.01); H04H 60/04 (2008.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01); H04H 60/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989774 A2 20000329; EP 0989774 A3 20000405; JP 2000102088 A 20000407

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021211

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI