Global Patent Index - EP 0989775 A1

EP 0989775 A1 2000-03-29 - Hearing aid with signal quality monitoring device

Title (en)

Hearing aid with signal quality monitoring device

Title (de)

Hörgerät mit Einrichtung zur Signalqualitätsüberwachung

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditif avec dispositif de contrôle de la qualité d'un signal

Publication

EP 0989775 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119254 A

Priority

  • EP 99119254 A
  • DE 29517266 U
  • EP 96110768 A
  • EP 96108958 A

Abstract (en)

The hearing aid has a microphone (10) for direct sound acquisition and for generating a corresponding electrical tone signal., at least one other signal transducer (11,12) operating on a different principle for alternative generation of a tone signal and a switch (20) for outputting one of the tone signals depending on a monitoring device (25) for subsequent amplification and output via a loudspeaker (64). The monitoring device monitors all tone signals, checks them for signal quality and selects the best signal using the switch.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Hörgerät mit einem Mikrofon (10) zur direkten Schallaufnahme und Erzeugung eines entsprechenden elektrischen Tonsignals, mindestens einem weiteren, nach einem anderen Aufnahmeprinzip arbeitenden Signalaufnehmer (11, 12) zur alternativen Erzeugung eines solchen Tonsignals, und einer Schalteinrichtung (20), welcher die Tonsignale von dem Mikrofon (10) und dem mindestens einen weiteren Signalaufnehmer (11, 12) zugeführt werden und welche eines dieser Tonsignale abhängig von einer Überwachungseinrichtung (25) zur nachfolgenden Verstärkung (30) und Abgabe über einen Lautsprecher (64) ausgibt. Die Überwachungseinrichtung (25) überwacht die Tonsignale des Mikrofons (10) und aller Signalaufnehmer (11, 12), überprüft diese Tonsignale auf ihre jeweilige Signalqualität und wählt mittels der Schalteinrichtung (20) zumindest dasjenige Tonsignal zur Verstärkung aus, das momentan die beste Signalqualität aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; H04R 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 25/43 (2013.01); H04R 25/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989775 A1 20000329; EP 0989775 B1 20040331; EP 0772375 A2 19970507; EP 0772375 A3 19980624

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LUX-WELLENHOF GABRIELE

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VINKE HERBERT

- Effective date: 20040731

2006-09-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040703

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LUX-WELLENHOF GABRIELE

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VINKE HERBERT

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610962 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0772375 P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VINKE, HERBERT

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 772375

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL