Global patent index - EP 0989781 A3

EP 0989781 A3 2000-06-21 - Multiple glazing and manufacturing method of plate glass coated in order to manufacture multiple glazing

Title (en)

Multiple glazing and manufacturing method of plate glass coated in order to manufacture multiple glazing

Title (de)

Mehrscheibenisolierglas und Verfahren zur Herstellung von beschichteten Flachgläsern zur Herstellung von Mehrscheibenisolierglas

Title (fr)

Vitrage multiple et procédé de fabrication de verre plat revêtu en vue de fabriquer du vitrage multiple

Publication

EP 0989781 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117757 A

Priority

DE 19844046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989781A2] The full coating of an electrically conductive transparent material on one of the glass sheets is deactivated within a sheet edge zone incorporating the contact area with a distance piece. An Independent claim is given for a method for producing glass sheets with an electrically conductive coating for multi-sheet glass panes. The method consists of coating glass with such a coating, cutting it into sheets with dimensions corresponding to those of the pane, and deactivating the coating within the sheet edge zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 27/06 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); H01B 5/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/84 (2013.01); F25D 23/02 (2013.01); H05B 2203/013 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01); H05B 2214/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989781 A2 20000329; EP 0989781 A3 20000621; EP 0989781 B1 20070131; AT 353187 T 20070215; BR 9904296 A 20000919; DE 19844046 A1 20000330; DE 19844046 C2 20010823; DE 59914177 D1 20070322; JP 2000103652 A 20000411; US 6268594 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090910

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-05-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-03-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT SE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990909

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI