Global patent index - EP 0989782 A2

EP 0989782 A2 2000-03-29 - Microwaves device and method of prepairing meals

Title (en)

Microwaves device and method of prepairing meals

Title (de)

Mikrowellengerät und Verfahren zur Zubereitung von Speisen

Title (fr)

Appareil micro-ondes et procédé de préparation de repas

Publication

EP 0989782 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118545 A

Priority

DE 19843656 A

Abstract (en)

The microwave controller (10) displays standing time as a function of the heating time and/or power setting. Its expiry is displayed (24). An Independent claim is included for the corresponding equipment.

Abstract (de)

Ein erfindungsgemäßes Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zubereitung von Speisen unter Verwendung eines Mikrowellengeräts zeichnen sich dadurch aus, daß von der Steuerung (10) des Mikrowellengeräts abhängig von der Erwärmungszeit (Auftauen, Erwärmen oder Garen) und/oder der eingestellten Leistungsstufe die Standzeit festgelegt wird und der Ablauf der Standzeit angezeigt wird, nach der der Temperaturausgleich in den Speisen erfolgt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6435 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989782 A2 20000329; EP 0989782 A3 20000412; DE 19843656 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20060918

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI