Global Patent Index - EP 0989785 A2

EP 0989785 A2 2000-03-29 - Circuit improvement for low pressure discharge lamp

Title (en)

Circuit improvement for low pressure discharge lamp

Title (de)

Verbesserte Anlaufschaltung für Niederdruck-Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Circuit amélioré pour lampe à décharge basse pression

Publication

EP 0989785 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112640 A

Priority

DE 19838830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838830A1] The start-up circuit has a sensor unit (TM) for a value dependent on the light flux or the temperature of the lamp, and controls the lamp current depending on the light flux or the temperature of the lamp. The lamp operating circuit is arranged so that the sensor unit has a temperature sensor (TM) for measuring a temperature dependent on the lamp temperature, arranged in a base of the lamp or in the operating circuit. The start up circuit with the sensor unit (TM) is integrated in a control integrated circuit (IC) of the operating circuit.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Betriebsschaltung für eine Niederdruckentladungslampe wird der Lampenstrom abhängig von der Lampentemperatur oder dem Lichtstrom gesteuert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/18 (2006.01); H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/38 (2006.01); H05B 41/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/386 (2013.01); H05B 41/39 (2013.01); Y10S 315/05 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838830 A1 20000302; AT 215297 T 20020415; CA 2281439 A1 20000226; CA 2281439 C 20090519; CN 1246029 A 20000301; EP 0989785 A2 20000329; EP 0989785 A3 20000412; EP 0989785 B1 20020327; JP 2000068081 A 20000303; KR 100404524 B1 20031105; KR 20000017548 A 20000325; TW 454427 B 20010911; US 6163114 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120810

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120709

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901049

- Effective date: 20111130

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901049 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215297 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/00 A, 7G 05F 1/00 B, 7H 01J 61/52 B, 7H 05B 37/02 B, 7H 05B 41/285 B, 7H 05B 41/38 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI