Global patent index - EP 0989786 A2

EP 0989786 A2 2000-03-29 - Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (en)

Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Steuerung der Helligkeit und des Betriebsverhaltens von Gasentladungslampen

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit de commande de l' intensité lumineuse et du comportement de lampes à décharge

Publication

EP 0989786 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126074 A

Priority

  • DE 4039161 A
  • EP 95114571 A
  • EP 91121150 A

Abstract (en)

A variable frequency inverter (30) supplies a load circuit (40), incorporating two fluorescent lamps (LA1, LA2). An integrated control circuit (17) includes a transceiver (10), to which commands are addressed for adjustment of the brightness and operational mode. With the lamps switched off, the inverter (30) is switched by a driver circuit (31) into SLEEP mode either immediately or after a preset delay, to be reactivated by reception of a fresh brightness command. It is fed from the mains via an on/off switch (S1) and a rectifier (20).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Steuerung der Helligkeit und des Betriebsverhaltens von Gasentladungslampen über ein elektronisches Vorschaltgerät (EVG), das einen Wechselspannungsgenerator (30), eine Gleichrichterschaltung (20), die den Wechselspannungsgenerator (30) speist, einen Lastkreis (40) mit mindestens einer Gasentladungslampe sowie eine Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung (17) aufweist, wobei der Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung (17) Befehle zur Steuerung und/oder Regelung der Helligkeit und des Betriebszustandes der mindestens einen Gasentladungslampe (LA1, LA2) zugeführt werden, wird bei Empfang eines einem SLEEP-Betriebszustand entsprechenden Abschaltbefehls die mindestens eine Gasentladungslampe (LA1, LA2) abgeschaltet und der Wechselspannungsgenerator sofort oder nach einer vorgegebenen Zeitspanne stillgelegt. Das elektronische Vorschaltgerät weist ferner eine Überwachungsschaltung (R12, C25) auf, welche auch im SLEEP-Betriebszustand aktiv bleibt und bei Ausfall der Versorgungswechselspannung (Uac) und Aufschalten einer aus Batterien oder von einem Generator gewonnenen Notgleichspannung (UN) auf die Leitung der Versorgungswechselspannung den normalen Zündvorgang einleitet und die mindestens eine Gasentladungslampe (LA1, LA2) auf eine vorgeschriebene Notbetriebshelligkeit einstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/298; H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01); H05B 41/28 (2006.01); H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01); H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3922 (2013.01); H05B 37/0254 (2013.01); H05B 41/28 (2013.01); H05B 41/2827 (2013.01); H05B 41/295 (2013.01); H05B 41/2983 (2013.01); H05B 41/36 (2013.01); H05B 41/3921 (2013.01); H05B 41/3925 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0490330 A1 19920617; EP 0490330 B1 19950830; AT 127312 T 19950915; AT 137078 T 19960515; AT 215770 T 20020415; AT 262774 T 20040415; DE 4039161 A1 19920611; DE 4039161 C2 20010531; EP 0490329 A1 19920617; EP 0490329 B1 19960417; EP 0688153 A2 19951220; EP 0688153 A3 19970226; EP 0689373 A2 19951227; EP 0689373 A3 19970507; EP 0701389 A2 19960313; EP 0701389 A3 19980826; EP 0701389 B1 20020403; EP 0701390 A2 19960313; EP 0701390 A3 19960605; EP 0706307 A2 19960410; EP 0706307 A3 19960710; EP 0989786 A2 20000329; EP 0989786 A3 20000823; EP 0989786 B1 20040324; EP 0989787 A2 20000329; EP 0989787 A3 20000524; ES 2087222 T3 19960716; FI 117464 B 20061013; FI 915757 A0 19911205; FI 915757 A 19920608; NO 300750 B1 19970714; NO 914820 A 19920609; NO 914820 D0 19911206

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111210

2011-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-12-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59109260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59109260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-03-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0701390

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0490329

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 41/298 A, 7H 05B 41/392 B, 7H 02J 9/06 B

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 490329

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 701390

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI