Global Patent Index - EP 0989786 A3

EP 0989786 A3 2000-08-23 - Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (en)

Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Steuerung der Helligkeit und des Betriebsverhaltens von Gasentladungslampen

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit de commande de l' intensité lumineuse et du comportement de lampes à décharge

Publication

EP 0989786 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99126074 A

Priority

  • DE 4039161 A
  • EP 95114571 A
  • EP 91121150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0490330A1] The invention relates in general to an electronic ballast (EVG) for fluorescent lamps. In particular, it relates to circuit arrangements inside the electronic ballast for separately measuring lamp current and heater coil current of lamp. Such an electronic ballast comprises an AC voltage generator (30, WR), whose frequency can be controlled, a series resonant circuit (L2, C17), which is connected to the output of the AC voltage generator (30) and to whose capacitor (C17) the gas discharge lamp is connected in parallel, and a current measuring element (R32) responding to the lamp current (IL1), at least one heating circuit of the heater coils of the gas discharge lamp being connected independently of the series resonant circuit (L2, C17) to the AC voltage generator (30), and a further current measuring element (R10) connected to said heating circuit serving to measure the heating current (JW). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/298; H02J 9/06; H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01); H05B 41/28 (2006.01); H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01); H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3922 (2013.01); H05B 37/0254 (2013.01); H05B 41/28 (2013.01); H05B 41/2827 (2013.01); H05B 41/295 (2013.01); H05B 41/2983 (2013.01); H05B 41/36 (2013.01); H05B 41/3921 (2013.01); H05B 41/3925 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0490330 A1 19920617; EP 0490330 B1 19950830; AT 127312 T 19950915; AT 137078 T 19960515; AT 215770 T 20020415; AT 262774 T 20040415; DE 4039161 A1 19920611; DE 4039161 C2 20010531; EP 0490329 A1 19920617; EP 0490329 B1 19960417; EP 0688153 A2 19951220; EP 0688153 A3 19970226; EP 0689373 A2 19951227; EP 0689373 A3 19970507; EP 0701389 A2 19960313; EP 0701389 A3 19980826; EP 0701389 B1 20020403; EP 0701390 A2 19960313; EP 0701390 A3 19960605; EP 0706307 A2 19960410; EP 0706307 A3 19960710; EP 0989786 A2 20000329; EP 0989786 A3 20000823; EP 0989786 B1 20040324; EP 0989787 A2 20000329; EP 0989787 A3 20000524; ES 2087222 T3 19960716; FI 117464 B 20061013; FI 915757 A0 19911205; FI 915757 A 19920608; NO 300750 B1 19970714; NO 914820 A 19920609; NO 914820 D0 19911206

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111210

2011-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-12-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59109260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59109260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-03-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0701390

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0490329

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 41/298 A, 7H 05B 41/392 B, 7H 02J 9/06 B

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 490329

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 701390

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI