Global Patent Index - EP 0989787 A2

EP 0989787 A2 2000-03-29 - Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (en)

Process and circuit for controlling the light intensity and the behaviour of gas discharge lamps

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnungen zur Steuerung der Helligkeit und des Betriebsverhaltens von Gasentladungslampen

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit de commande de l' intensité lumineuse et du comportement de lampes à décharge

Publication

EP 0989787 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126075 A

Priority

  • DE 4039161 A
  • EP 95114340 A
  • EP 91121150 A

Abstract (en)

A variable frequency inverter (30) supplies a load circuit (40), incorporating two fluorescent lamps (LA1, LA2). An integrated control circuit (17) includes a transceiver (10), to which commands are addressed for adjustment of the brightness and operational mode. With the lamps switched off, the inverter (30) is switched by a driver circuit (31) into SLEEP mode either immediately or after a preset delay, to be reactivated by reception of a fresh brightness command. It is fed from the mains via an on/off switch (S1) and a rectifier (20).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Steuerung der Helligkeit und des Betriebsverhaltens von Gasentladungslampen über ein elektronisches Vorschaltgerät (EVG), wobei das elektronische Vorschaltgerät einen Wechselspannungsgenerator (30), eine Gleichrichterschaltung (20), die den Wechselspannungsgenerator (30) speist, einen Lastkreis (40) mit mindestens einer Gasentladungslampe (LA1, LA2) und eine Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung (17) aufweist, werden der Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung (17) digitale Sollwerte zur Steuerung und/oder Regelung der Helligkeit der mindestens einen Gasentladungslampe (LA1, LA2) zugeführt. Die Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung (17) ist so ausgebildet, daß die durch die digitalen Sollwerte bedingten Helligkeitsstufen inkremental anwachsend sind. Auf diese Weise kann über einen großen Helligkeitsbereich eine genaue Regulierung der Lampenhelligkeit erzielt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01); H05B 41/28 (2006.01); H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01); H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3922 (2013.01); H05B 37/0254 (2013.01); H05B 41/28 (2013.01); H05B 41/2827 (2013.01); H05B 41/295 (2013.01); H05B 41/2983 (2013.01); H05B 41/36 (2013.01); H05B 41/3921 (2013.01); H05B 41/3925 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0490330 A1 19920617; EP 0490330 B1 19950830; AT 127312 T 19950915; AT 137078 T 19960515; AT 215770 T 20020415; AT 262774 T 20040415; DE 4039161 A1 19920611; DE 4039161 C2 20010531; EP 0490329 A1 19920617; EP 0490329 B1 19960417; EP 0688153 A2 19951220; EP 0688153 A3 19970226; EP 0689373 A2 19951227; EP 0689373 A3 19970507; EP 0701389 A2 19960313; EP 0701389 A3 19980826; EP 0701389 B1 20020403; EP 0701390 A2 19960313; EP 0701390 A3 19960605; EP 0706307 A2 19960410; EP 0706307 A3 19960710; EP 0989786 A2 20000329; EP 0989786 A3 20000823; EP 0989786 B1 20040324; EP 0989787 A2 20000329; EP 0989787 A3 20000524; ES 2087222 T3 19960716; FI 117464 B 20061013; FI 915757 A0 19911205; FI 915757 A 19920608; NO 300750 B1 19970714; NO 914820 A 19920609; NO 914820 D0 19911206

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040713

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 490329

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 688153

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE