Global patent index - EP 0989809 A1

EP 0989809 A1 2000-04-05 - THREE DIMENSIONAL SHOE VAMP AIR CUSHION

Title (en)

THREE DIMENSIONAL SHOE VAMP AIR CUSHION

Title (de)

DREIDIMENSIONALE LUFTPOLSTERUNG FÜR EIN SCHUHWERK

Title (fr)

COUSSIN D'AIR TRIDIMENSIONNEL POUR EMPEIGNE DE CHAUSSURES

Publication

EP 0989809 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909026 A

Priority

  • US 9804481 W
  • US 87445297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857562A1] A three dimensional shoe vamp air cushion (1, 20) having an upper sheet and a lower sheet, with all pheripheral edges sealed to form a hollow interior. An upper area of the air cushion is larger than the interior area, permitting the air cushion body to have three dimensions instead of two dimensions. The three dimensional shoe vamp air cushion has one or more air chambers and a similar curvature as the upper surface of a foot, so as to have excellent adaptability and shock absorbing characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2013.01); A43B 23/029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857562 A1 19981223; AU 6690998 A 19990104; AU 726072 B2 20001026; CA 2292394 A1 19981223; CN 1199598 C 20050504; CN 1260690 A 20000719; EP 0989809 A1 20000405; EP 0989809 A4 20020911; RU 2180792 C2 20020327

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060513

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041208

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUANG, ING-JING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HUANG, ING-JING

2002-09-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 43B 23/26 A, 7A 43B 5/04 B

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE