Global Patent Index - EP 0989809 A4

EP 0989809 A4 2002-09-11 - THREE DIMENSIONAL SHOE VAMP AIR CUSHION

Title (en)

THREE DIMENSIONAL SHOE VAMP AIR CUSHION

Title (de)

DREIDIMENSIONALE LUFTPOLSTERUNG FÜR EIN SCHUHWERK

Title (fr)

COUSSIN D'AIR TRIDIMENSIONNEL POUR EMPEIGNE DE CHAUSSURES

Publication

EP 0989809 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98909026 A

Priority

  • US 9804481 W
  • US 87445297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857562A1] A three dimensional shoe vamp air cushion (1, 20) having an upper sheet and a lower sheet, with all pheripheral edges sealed to form a hollow interior. An upper area of the air cushion is larger than the interior area, permitting the air cushion body to have three dimensions instead of two dimensions. The three dimensional shoe vamp air cushion has one or more air chambers and a similar curvature as the upper surface of a foot, so as to have excellent adaptability and shock absorbing characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 23/26; A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2013.01); A43B 23/029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857562 A1 19981223; AU 6690998 A 19990104; AU 726072 B2 20001026; CA 2292394 A1 19981223; CN 1199598 C 20050504; CN 1260690 A 20000719; EP 0989809 A1 20000405; EP 0989809 A4 20020911; RU 2180792 C2 20020327

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060513

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041208

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUANG, ING-JING

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUANG, ING-JING

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 43B 23/26 A, 7A 43B 5/04 B

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE