Global Patent Index - EP 0989815 A1

EP 0989815 A1 2000-04-05 - DEVICE FOR ILLUMINATING FOODSTUFF DISPLAYED ON A REFRIGERATOR CABINET SHELVES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ILLUMINATING FOODSTUFF DISPLAYED ON A REFRIGERATOR CABINET SHELVES

Title (de)

BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUF REGALEN IN KÜHLMÖBELN AUSGESTELLTEN LEBENSMITTELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE DE DENREES EXPOSEES SUR DES ETAGERES D'UN MEUBLE FRIGORIFIQUE

Publication

EP 0989815 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98932217 A

Priority

  • FR 9801265 W
  • FR 9707581 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764787A1] The invention concerns a device for illuminating foodstuff displayed on a refrigerator cabinet shelves, comprising at least a source of illuminating light (12), such as fluorescent tube, mounted on a shelf (1) at the front thereof. The device is characterised in that the light source (12) is arranged at a predetermined distance at the front (17) of the shelf (1) to which it is associated, in a location situated inside in front of the cold air flow constituting the cold air curtain (6) in front of the refrigerator cabinet. The invention is useful for refrigerator cabinets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 11/10; A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); A47F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 11/10 (2013.01); A47F 3/0447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764787 A1 19981224; FR 2764787 B1 19990813; DE 69813806 D1 20030528; DE 69813806 T2 20040401; EP 0989815 A1 20000405; EP 0989815 B1 20030423; ES 2197478 T3 20040101; WO 9857571 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130617

2014-07-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140709

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130616

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813806

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197478 T3

2003-10-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813806 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REFRIGERATOR WITH A DEVICE FOR ILLUMINATING FOODSTUFF DISPLAYED ON A SHELVES

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT