Global Patent Index - EP 0989819 A1

EP 0989819 A1 2000-04-05 - DEVICE FOR WASHING ALL TYPES OF CURTAINS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR WASHING ALL TYPES OF CURTAINS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM WASCHEN VON VORHÄNGEN ALLER ART

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LAVER DES RIDEAUX DE TOUT TYPE

Publication

EP 0989819 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936249 A

Priority

  • DE 9801743 W
  • DE 19727537 A
  • DE 19747524 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900047A1] Known washing machines of this kind include a spraying device which is directly or indirectly supported on a runner that is subjected to considerable strain. The specially designed spraying device is only suitable for use with vertical strips. The invention provides a spraying device which is extremely easy to build and which can be used for all types of curtains. The novel spraying device (3) has only two upper metal sheets (9) and only one supply line (5) for both nozzle strips (12, 26). It is supported by an external holding device, e.g. a sucker (18). A special arrangement of the nozzle strips (12, 26) and a special nozzle (28) design enable a good, homogenous cleaning effect to be obtained for the entire length of the curtains (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 4/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900047A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900047 A1 19990107; AT 215337 T 20020415; EP 0989819 A1 20000405; EP 0989819 B1 20020403; JP 2002506372 A 20020226; US 6324875 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2007-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-09-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803631 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215337 T 20020415

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL