Global Patent Index - EP 0989822 A1

EP 0989822 A1 2000-04-05 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PROVIDING ACOUSTIC HEMOSTASIS

Title (en)

METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PROVIDING ACOUSTIC HEMOSTASIS

Title (de)

METHODEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERSCHAFFUNG AKUSTISCHER HEMOSTASIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS D'HEMOSTASE ACOUSTIQUE

Publication

EP 0989822 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97941317 A

Priority

  • CA 2253664 A
  • US 9710848 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858588A1] Methods and apparatus for the remote coagulation of blood using high-intensity focused ultrasound (HIFU) are provided. A remote hemostasis method comprises identifying a site (72, 82) of internal bleeding and focusing therapeutic ultrasound energy (50, 52, 54, 58, 92) on the site (72, 82), the energy (50, 52, 54, 58, 92) being focused through an intervening tissue. An apparatus for producing remote hemostasis comprises a focused therapeutic ultrasound radiating sufrace (50, 52, 54, 58, 92) and a sensor (45, 56, 60, 96) for identifying a site (72, 82) of internal bleeding, with a registration means (34, 62, 64, 66, 68) coupled to the radiating surface (50, 52, 54, 58) and the sensor to (45, 56, 60) bring a focal target (76, 78, 88) and the bleeding site (72, 82) into alignment. The sensor (45, 56, 60, 96) generally comprises a Doppler imaging display. Hemostasis enhancing agents may be introduced to the site (72, 82) for actuation by the ultrasound energy (50, 52, 54, 58, 92).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/00; A61N 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61B 8/12 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 18/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61N 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61B 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 7/022 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00106 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00504 (2013.01); A61B 2017/12004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858588 A1 19981230; CA 2253664 A1 20000504; CA 2253664 C 20120710; EP 0989822 A1 20000405; EP 0989822 A4 20040728; JP 2002516586 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070521

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-07-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 17/00 A

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61N 7/02 B

2000-04-19 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE