Global Patent Index - EP 0989835 A1

EP 0989835 A1 2000-04-05 - LARGE BEAM SCANNING LASER ABLATION

Title (en)

LARGE BEAM SCANNING LASER ABLATION

Title (de)

LASER ABLATION MIT GROSSFLÄCHIGEM ABTASTSTRAHL

Title (fr)

ABLATION PAR LASER A FAISCEAU A GRANDE ENVERGURE DE BALAYAGE

Publication

EP 0989835 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929122 A

Priority

  • AU 9800465 W
  • AU PO736797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857604A1] The present invention provides a method for ablating material including directing a laser beam through a mask and through a scanning unit to an area of the material to thereby ablate the material, wherein the scanning unit can scan or be controlled to scan the beam in a predetermined pattern on the material, and an apparatus for laser ablation of material including a laser source for producing a beam of far ultra-violet or infra-red light, a mask, means for directing the beam through the mask and a computer-controlled scanning unit for scanning or being controlled to scan the beam in a predetermined pattern on the material, wherein the beam is directed to an area of the material to be ablated. The mask may be of variable area, and this area may be increased during a single use of the apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/01 (2006.01); B23K 26/066 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/00817 (2013.01); A61F 9/00804 (2013.01); B23K 26/066 (2015.10); A61F 2009/00872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857604 A1 19981223; AU PO736797 A0 19970710; CA 2294592 A1 19981223; EP 0989835 A1 20000405; EP 0989835 A4 20030326

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027018

2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-03-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61F 9/013 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61F 9/00 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23K 26/06 B

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: Q-VIS LIMITED

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN SAARLOOS, PAUL, PHILLIP

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000117;RO PAYMENT 20000117